Text: H.R.445 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/10/2019)


116th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 445


To amend the VOW to Hire Heroes Act of 2011 to make permanent the Veterans Retraining Assistance Program, and for other purposes.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

January 10, 2019

Ms. Brownley of California introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs


A BILL

To amend the VOW to Hire Heroes Act of 2011 to make permanent the Veterans Retraining Assistance Program, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Help Hire Our Heroes Act”.

SEC. 2. Veterans retraining assistance program.

(a) Permanent program.—Section 211 of the VOW to Hire Heroes Act of 2011 (Public Law 112–56; 38 U.S.C. 4100 note) is amended—

(1) in subsection (a)(2)(B), by striking “the period beginning October 1, 2012, and ending March 31, 2014” and inserting “each subsequent fiscal year that the program is carried out”; and

(2) by striking subsection (k).

(b) Conforming amendments.—Such section is further amended—

(1) in subsection (a)(1), by striking “Not later than July 1, 2012, the” and inserting “The”;

(2) in subsection (b), by striking “Except as provided by subsection (k), each” and inserting “Each”;

(3) in subsection (e)(1)(G), by striking “by not later than October 1, 2013,”;

(4) by striking subsection (i); and

(5) by redesignating subsections (j) and (l) as subsections (i) and (j), respectively.