There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

S.O.S. Veterans Caregivers Act
Support Our Services to Veterans Caregivers Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to clarify that caregivers for veterans with serious illnesses are eligible for assistance and support services provided by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/20/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
11/08/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
09/20/2019Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/20/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 11/22/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 02/25/2020
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/05/2020
Rep. Fletcher, Lizzie [D-TX-7] 12/28/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs09/20/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health11/08/2019 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4451.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4451. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/20/2019)

Support our Services to Veterans Caregivers Act or the S.O.S. Veterans Caregivers Act

This bill expands eligibility for assistance under the Department of Veterans Affairs Program of Comprehensive Assistance for Family Caregivers. Specifically, the bill expands eligibility for such assistance to caregivers of veterans who have a serious illness that was incurred or aggravated during active military, naval, or air service. Under current law, such assistance is already provided to caregivers of veterans who sustained serious injuries in the course of their military, naval, or air service.

The bill also requires the provision of an annual multidimensional assessment to measure burdens felt by family caregivers who are designated as the primary providers of personal care services to such veterans.