There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To rename the Saint Lawrence Seaway Development Corporation the Great Lakes St. Lawrence Seaway Development Corporation.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
10/01/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
09/04/2020Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-487.
09/24/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/19/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
10/01/2020-4:26pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/01/2020-4:26pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5191-5192)
10/01/2020-4:23pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4470.
10/01/2020-4:23pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5191-5192)
10/01/2020-4:23pmHouseMr. Carbajal moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/04/2020HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 390.
09/04/2020HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-487.
02/26/2020HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/26/2020HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/26/2020HouseSubcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged.
09/25/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
09/24/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
09/24/2019HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1204)
09/24/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (10)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Transportation and Infrastructure09/24/2019 Referred to
02/26/2020 Markup by
09/04/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-487
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment09/25/2019 Referred to
02/26/2020 Discharged from
Senate Environment and Public Works10/19/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4470. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (10/01/2020)

This bill renames the Saint Lawrence Seaway Development Corporation as the Great Lakes St. Lawrence Seaway Development Corporation.