There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Malala Yousafzai Scholarship Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Malala Yousafzai Scholarship Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Malala Yousafzai Scholarship Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Malala Yousafzai Scholarship Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To expand the number of scholarships available to Pakistani women under the Merit and Needs-Based Scholarship Program.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
01/13/2021Became Public Law No: 116-338.
01/13/2021Signed by President.
01/03/2021Presented to President.
01/01/2021Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S8015 - 8016)
01/01/2021Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/03/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 374 - 16 (Roll no. 82).
09/26/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/13/2021Became Public Law No: 116-338.
01/13/2021Signed by President.
01/03/2021HousePresented to President.
01/02/2021SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
01/01/2021SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S8015 - 8016)
01/01/2021SenateSenate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/04/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
03/03/2020-2:09pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/03/2020-2:09pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 374 - 16 (Roll no. 82). (text: CR H1450-1451)
03/03/2020-2:00pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1457-1458)
03/03/2020-12:42pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/03/2020-12:29pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4508.
03/03/2020-12:29pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1450-1452)
03/03/2020-12:29pmHouseMr. Cicilline moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
12/18/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
12/18/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
09/26/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
09/26/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (32)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs09/26/2019 Referred to
12/18/2019 Markup by
Senate Foreign Relations03/04/2020 Referred to
01/01/2021 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.4508.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.4508. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-338 (01/13/2021)

Malala Yousafzai Scholarship Act

This bill requires the U.S. Agency for International Development to award at least 50% of the number of scholarships under the Merit and Needs-Based Scholarship Program to Pakistani women for each of the calendar years 2020-2022.