There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Don't Break Up the T-Band Act of 2020

Short Titles as Reported to House

Don't Break Up the T-Band Act of 2020

Short Titles as Introduced

Don't Break Up the T-Band Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To repeal the requirement to reallocate and auction the T-Band spectrum, to amend the Wireless Communications and Public Safety Act of 1999 to clarify acceptable 9-1-1 obligations or expenditures, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To repeal the section of the Middle Class Tax Relief and Job Creation Act of 2012 that requires the Federal Communications Commission to reallocate and auction the T-Band spectrum.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/23/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 410 - 5 (Roll no. 201).
09/18/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-521.
01/10/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/24/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
09/23/2020-4:28pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
09/23/2020-4:28pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/23/2020-4:28pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 410 - 5 (Roll no. 201). (text: CR 9/21/2020 H4614-4615)
09/23/2020-3:50pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4773-4774)
09/21/2020-5:42pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/21/2020-5:34pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 451.
09/21/2020-5:34pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4614-4616)
09/21/2020-5:34pmHouseMr. McNerney moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/18/2020HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 421.
09/18/2020HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-521.
07/15/2020HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/15/2020HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/10/2020HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology
03/10/2020HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology
02/27/2020HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology
01/25/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/10/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
01/10/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (24)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/10/2019 Referred to
07/15/2020 Markup by
09/18/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-521
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology01/25/2019 Referred to
02/27/2020 Hearings by
03/10/2020 Markup by
03/10/2020 Reported by
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation09/24/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.451. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/10/2019)

Don't Break Up the T-Band Act of 2019

This bill repeals the requirement for the Federal Communications Commission to reallocate and auction the 470-512 MHz band (referred to as the "T-Band spectrum"). The T-Band spectrum is a frequency range currently utilized by public-safety entities in certain urban areas.