There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Public Servants Protection and Fairness Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title II of the Social Security Act to provide an equitable Social Security formula for individuals with noncovered employment and to provide relief for individuals currently affected by the Windfall Elimination Provision.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/27/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
09/27/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
09/27/2019Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/27/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (143)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 10/30/2019
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/30/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/30/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/30/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 10/30/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 10/30/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 10/30/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/30/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 10/30/2019
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 10/30/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 10/30/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 10/30/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 10/30/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/30/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 10/30/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 10/30/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 10/30/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 10/30/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 10/30/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 10/30/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 10/30/2019
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 10/30/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 10/30/2019
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 10/30/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/30/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 10/30/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 10/30/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 10/30/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 10/30/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 10/30/2019
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 10/30/2019
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 10/30/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 10/30/2019
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2] 10/30/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 10/30/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/30/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 10/30/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 10/30/2019
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/30/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 10/30/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/30/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 10/30/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/31/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 11/12/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 11/12/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 11/12/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 11/12/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 11/12/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 11/12/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 11/12/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 11/18/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/18/2019
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 11/18/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 11/18/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 11/18/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 11/18/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 11/18/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/18/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 11/26/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 11/26/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 11/26/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/26/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/26/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 11/26/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 11/26/2019
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/05/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 12/05/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 12/05/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 12/05/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 12/05/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/05/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 12/05/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 12/05/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 12/05/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 12/12/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 12/12/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 12/12/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/12/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 12/12/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/19/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 12/19/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/19/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 12/19/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 12/19/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 12/19/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/19/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 01/15/2020
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 01/15/2020
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 01/15/2020
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 01/15/2020
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 01/15/2020
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/15/2020
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 01/27/2020
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/27/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 01/27/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 01/27/2020
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 01/27/2020
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 01/27/2020
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 01/27/2020
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/27/2020
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 01/27/2020
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 01/27/2020
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 01/27/2020
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 01/27/2020
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 01/27/2020
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 01/27/2020
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 01/27/2020
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 01/30/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 01/30/2020
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 01/30/2020
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 01/30/2020
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 01/30/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 01/30/2020
Rep. Fletcher, Lizzie [D-TX-7] 02/10/2020
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/10/2020
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 02/10/2020
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 02/10/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 02/10/2020
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 02/10/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 02/10/2020
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 02/10/2020
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 02/10/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 02/10/2020
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6] 02/10/2020
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 02/25/2020
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 02/25/2020
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/25/2020
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 02/25/2020
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 02/25/2020
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 02/25/2020
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 02/25/2020
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 02/28/2020
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 02/28/2020
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 02/28/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 02/28/2020
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8] 03/10/2020
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 03/10/2020
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 03/10/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/10/2020
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 03/10/2020
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/07/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/15/2020
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 08/11/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means09/27/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Social Security09/27/2019 Referred to

As of 08/12/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4540 - Public Servants Protection and Fairness Act


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.