There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To make permanent the authority of the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to make grants for the transportation of highly rural veterans to medical care.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
10/01/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
10/14/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
10/01/2019Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/01/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3]* 10/01/2019
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17]* 10/01/2019
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large]* 10/01/2019
Rep. Roy, Chip [R-TX-21] 10/08/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 10/08/2019
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-16] 10/11/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 10/11/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 10/16/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 10/23/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 10/23/2019
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 10/23/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 10/23/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 11/08/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/08/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/08/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/08/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 11/08/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 11/13/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/15/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 11/19/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 11/19/2019
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 11/20/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 11/20/2019
Rep. Hagedorn, Jim [R-MN-1] 11/20/2019
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 11/20/2019
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 11/22/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 11/22/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 11/22/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 11/26/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 11/26/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 12/03/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 12/03/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 12/06/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 12/06/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 12/06/2019
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2] 12/09/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/08/2020
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 01/08/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs10/01/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health10/14/2019 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4589.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4589. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/01/2019)

This bill permanently extends the authority of the Department of Veterans Affairs to make grants for the transportation of highly rural veterans to health care facilities.