There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Protect the GI Bill Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Protect the GI Bill Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to require that educational institutions abide by certain principles as a condition of approval for purposes of the educational assistance programs of the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
11/12/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8746-8749)
10/08/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
11/13/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
11/12/2019-4:26pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/12/2019-4:26pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8746-8749)
11/12/2019-4:06pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4625.
11/12/2019-4:06pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8746-8751)
11/12/2019-4:06pmHouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/16/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
10/16/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
10/16/2019HouseSubcommittee on Economic Opportunity Discharged.
10/14/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
10/08/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
10/08/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/12/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs10/08/2019 Referred to
10/16/2019 Markup by
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity10/14/2019 Referred to
10/16/2019 Discharged from
Senate Veterans' Affairs11/13/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4625. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/08/2019)

Protect the GI Bill Act

This bill imposes requirements and restrictions on educational institutions participating in the educational assistance programs of the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA).

The bill limits participation in VA educational assistance programs if an educational institution (1) does not perform specified actions, such as providing cost information to individuals prior to enrollment; (2) implements fraudulent recruiting techniques or pays inducements to secure enrollments; or (3) is the subject of a negative action by its accrediting agency. The state approving agency or the VA shall impose limitations by publishing a warning or temporarily prohibiting the pursuit of a course of education at an institution.

The bill provides for waivers of certain requirements for a one-year period, but waivers may not be provided for more than two consecutive academic years.

The bill also prohibits the VA from approving the enrollment of an eligible veteran or eligible person in any course offered by an institution engaged in substantial misrepresentation (e.g., misrepresenting the size, location, facilities, or equipment of the institution).

Finally, the bill modifies the criteria that non-accredited courses must meet to be eligible for educational assistance. The bill adds requirements for (1) the educational institution offering the course to refrain from substantial misrepresentation; and (2) the state approving agency to review advertising, sales, or enrollment materials used by the institution