There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Terrorism Risk Insurance Program Reauthorization Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Terrorism Risk Insurance Program Reauthorization Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize the Terrorism Risk Insurance Act of 2002, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
11/18/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 385 - 22 (Roll no. 626).(text: CR H8932-8933)
10/11/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
11/19/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
11/18/2019-7:07pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/18/2019-7:07pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 385 - 22 (Roll no. 626). (text: CR H8932-8933)
11/18/2019-6:59pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8940-8941)
11/18/2019-6:19pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
11/18/2019-5:51pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4634.
11/18/2019-5:51pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8932-8937)
11/18/2019-5:51pmHouseMs. Waters moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/31/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 57 - 0.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
10/31/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
10/30/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
10/29/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
10/11/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
10/11/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (86)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 10/11/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 10/11/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 10/11/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 10/11/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 10/11/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 10/11/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 10/11/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 10/11/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 10/11/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 10/11/2019
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5]* 10/11/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 10/11/2019
Rep. McAdams, Ben [D-UT-4]* 10/11/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 10/11/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 10/11/2019
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5]* 10/11/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3]* 10/11/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 10/11/2019
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1]* 10/11/2019
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 10/11/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 10/11/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 10/11/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29]* 10/11/2019
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10]* 10/11/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4]* 10/11/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3]* 10/11/2019
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 10/11/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 10/28/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 10/28/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/28/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 10/28/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/28/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 10/28/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/28/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 10/28/2019
Rep. San Nicolas, Michael F. Q. [D-GU-At Large] 10/28/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 10/28/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/28/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 10/28/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 10/28/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 10/28/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 10/28/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 10/28/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/28/2019
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 10/28/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 11/18/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 11/18/2019
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 11/18/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 11/18/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 11/18/2019
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 11/18/2019
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 11/18/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/18/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 11/18/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 11/18/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 11/18/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 11/18/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 11/18/2019
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 11/18/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 11/18/2019
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 11/18/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 11/18/2019
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 11/18/2019
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 11/18/2019
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 11/18/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 11/18/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 11/18/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 11/18/2019
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 11/18/2019
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 11/18/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 11/18/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 11/18/2019
Rep. Rose, John W. [R-TN-6] 11/18/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 11/18/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 11/18/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 11/18/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 11/18/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 11/18/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/18/2019
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11] 11/18/2019
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8] 11/18/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/18/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 11/18/2019
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 11/18/2019
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 11/18/2019
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/18/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services10/11/2019 Referred to
10/31/2019 Markup by
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs11/19/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4634. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (11/18/2019)

Terrorism Risk Insurance Program Reauthorization Act of 2019

This bill reauthorizes through 2027 the Terrorism Risk Insurance Program within the Department of the Treasury. The Government Accountability Office must report on insurance coverage of cyberterrorism.