There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to improve dependency and indemnity compensation for survivors of certain totally disabled veterans.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/10/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
09/24/2019-7:04pmASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mr. Balderson asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 464, a bill originally introduced by Representative Jones, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/01/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
01/10/2019Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/10/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12] 10/16/2019
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 10/16/2019
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 10/21/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 11/08/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/27/2020
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/18/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs01/10/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs02/01/2019 Referred to

As of 11/29/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.464 - To amend title 38, United States Code, to improve dependency and indemnity compensation for survivors of certain totally disabled veterans.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.464. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/10/2019)

This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to treat a notification of the death of a veteran rated totally disabled at the time of death as a claim by the veteran's surviving spouse and children for dependency and indemnity compensation benefits. The VA may not require that such spouse and children file a claim for such benefits.