There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Medicare Dental Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide coverage for certain dental items and services under part B of the Medicare program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/11/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
10/22/2019Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
10/22/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
10/17/2019Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
10/17/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
10/17/2019Subcommittee on Health Discharged.
10/12/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/11/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/11/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/11/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives
09/25/2019Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Health Prior to Introduction and Referral.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce10/11/2019 Referred to
10/17/2019 Markup by
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health10/12/2019 Referred to
09/25/2019 Hearings by
10/17/2019 Discharged from
House Ways and Means10/11/2019 Referred to
10/22/2019 Markup by

As of 11/15/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4650 - Medicare Dental Act of 2019


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.