There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Helping Seniors Afford Health Care Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Helping Seniors Afford Health Care Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend titles XVIII and XIX of the Social Security Act to reduce cost-sharing, align income and resource eligibility tests, simplify enrollment, and provide for other program improvements for low-income Medicare beneficiaries.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
01/24/2020Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
01/24/2020Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-381, Part I.
10/15/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date All Actions
01/24/2020Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 305.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/24/2020Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/24/2020Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-381, Part I.
10/17/2019Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/17/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/17/2019Subcommittee on Health Discharged.
10/16/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/15/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
10/15/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/15/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/15/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8141)
Action By: House of Representatives
10/15/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives
09/25/2019Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Health Prior to Introduction and Referral.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce10/15/2019 Referred to
10/17/2019 Markup by
01/24/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-381
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health10/16/2019 Referred to
09/25/2019 Hearings by
10/17/2019 Discharged from
House Ways and Means10/15/2019 Referred to
01/24/2020 Discharged from
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health10/15/2019 Referred to

As of 10/27/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4671 - Helping Seniors Afford Health Care Act


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.