There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

National World War II Memorial Commemorative Coin Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of the Treasury to mint coins in commemoration of the National World War II Memorial in Washington, DC, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
10/15/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
10/15/2019Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/15/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (124)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21]* 10/15/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 10/18/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 10/18/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/31/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 11/08/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/12/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 11/12/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/13/2019
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 11/13/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 11/13/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 11/18/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/18/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 11/20/2019
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 11/20/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 11/20/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 11/21/2019
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 12/03/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 12/04/2019
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1] 12/04/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 12/05/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 12/06/2019
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 12/06/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 12/12/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 12/18/2019
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 12/19/2019
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 12/19/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 01/08/2020
Rep. Cline, Ben [R-VA-6] 01/09/2020
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 01/13/2020
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 01/13/2020
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 01/14/2020
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 01/14/2020
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/14/2020
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 01/16/2020
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large] 01/16/2020
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 01/16/2020
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 01/17/2020
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 01/24/2020
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 01/30/2020
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/03/2020
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/11/2020
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 02/12/2020
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 02/14/2020
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 02/21/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/21/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 02/21/2020
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 02/25/2020
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 02/25/2020
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 03/03/2020
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/03/2020
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 03/03/2020
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/03/2020
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 03/03/2020
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 03/09/2020
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/10/2020
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 03/10/2020
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/23/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/23/2020
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 04/23/2020
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 04/23/2020
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/12/2020
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 05/12/2020
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 05/12/2020
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17] 05/14/2020
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/15/2020
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 05/22/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 05/22/2020
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/22/2020
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 06/04/2020
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 06/04/2020
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/04/2020
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 06/04/2020
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 06/04/2020
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 06/04/2020
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/04/2020
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/15/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 06/15/2020
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 06/15/2020
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/15/2020
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 06/15/2020
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/15/2020
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 06/15/2020
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 06/15/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 06/15/2020
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 06/15/2020
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 06/15/2020
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 06/15/2020
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/22/2020
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 06/22/2020
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/24/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 06/25/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/01/2020
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/02/2020
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 07/09/2020
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 07/13/2020
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/13/2020
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/13/2020
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15] 07/13/2020
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 07/23/2020
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/23/2020
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/23/2020
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 07/23/2020
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-16] 07/24/2020
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 07/24/2020
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/29/2020
Rep. Joyce, John [R-PA-13] 07/29/2020
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/29/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services10/15/2019 Referred to

As of 08/03/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4681 - National World War II Memorial Commemorative Coin Act


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4681. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/15/2019)

National World War II Memorial Commemorative Coin Act

This bill directs the Department of the Treasury to mint and issue up to 50,000 $5 coins, 400,000 $1 silver coins, and 750,000 half-dollar clad coins in commemoration of the National World War II Memorial in the District of Columbia.

The design of the coins shall be emblematic of the memorial and the service and sacrifice of American soldiers and civilians during World War II.

All surcharges received from the sale of such coins shall be paid to the Friends of the National World War II Memorial to support the National Park Service in maintaining and repairing the memorial, and for educational and commemorative programs.