There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Sami's Law

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Sami’s Law

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To require ride-hailing companies to implement an enhanced digital system to verify passengers with their authorized ride-hailing vehicles and drivers.

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 23, United States Code, to compel States to require illuminated signs and other measures on ride-hailing vehicles, to prohibit the sale of such signs, to require ride-hailing companies to implement an electronic access system on ride-hailing vehicles.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
07/29/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3921-3923)
10/15/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/30/2020SenateReceived in the Senate.
07/29/2020-2:13pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
07/29/2020-2:12pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/29/2020-2:12pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3921-3923)
07/29/2020-1:39pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4686.
07/29/2020-1:39pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3921-3927)
07/29/2020-1:38pmHouseMr. DeFazio moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/17/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/16/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
10/15/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
10/15/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
10/15/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (11)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Transportation and Infrastructure10/15/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit10/16/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce10/15/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce10/17/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4686. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (07/29/2020)

Sami's Law

This bill establishes requirements for transportation network companies. A transportation network company (TNC) is an entity that uses a digital network to connect riders to drivers affiliated with the entity to transport the rider using a vehicle owned, leased, or otherwise authorized for use by the driver to a point chosen by the rider.

Each TNC must establish and implement a system and policy within its platform to make available to each passenger a digital method to verify that the driver with whom the passenger has been matched through the platform has been authorized by the TNC to accept the passenger's trip request prior to the beginning of the trip.

The Department of Transportation (DOT) must establish the Safety Actions for Matching and Identifying Ride Share Customers' Council (SAMI'S Law Council) that is an advisory council for developing recommended performance standards for successor technology that will protect TNC passengers and drivers.

The bill prohibits the sale of any signage that is designed to help a passenger identify a TNC vehicle and contains a TNC's proprietary trademark or logo, or purports to be that of a TNC, unless the sale is authorized by the TNC.

DOT may issue penalties to a TNC for noncompliance with this bill, including up to $20,000 each day when such noncompliance is knowing and willful.

The Government Accountability Office must conduct a study on the incidence of assault and abuse perpetrated on drivers by passengers of TNC vehicles and on such passengers by drivers of TNC vehicles.