There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Countering Turkish Aggression Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To impose sanctions with respect to Turkey, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/16/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
11/15/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
10/16/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/16/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/16/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/16/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/16/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/16/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (117)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Cline, Ben [R-VA-6]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Green, Mark E. [R-TN-7]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4]* 10/16/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 10/16/2019
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Rose, John W. [R-TN-6]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Steil, Bryan [R-WI-1]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 10/16/2019
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 10/16/2019
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8]* 10/16/2019
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Timmons, William R. IV [R-SC-4]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Hagedorn, Jim [R-MN-1]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Armstrong, Kelly [R-ND-At Large]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Miller, Carol D. [R-WV-3]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 10/16/2019
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Roy, Chip [R-TX-21]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 10/16/2019
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Fulcher, Russ [R-ID-1] 10/17/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/17/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6] 10/17/2019
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 10/18/2019
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1] 10/18/2019
Rep. Johnson, Dusty [R-SD-At Large] 10/18/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 10/18/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 10/21/2019
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/29/2019

Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs10/16/2019 Referred to
House Financial Services10/16/2019 Referred to
House Oversight and Reform10/16/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary10/16/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship11/15/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means10/16/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.