There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

End the Limo Loophole Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 49, United States Code, to modify the definition of commercial motor vehicle, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/16/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
10/17/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
10/16/2019Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/16/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 10/17/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 10/17/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 10/17/2019
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 10/22/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 10/22/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 10/22/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 10/22/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 10/22/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 10/22/2019
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 10/22/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/22/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 10/22/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/22/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/28/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 10/28/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 10/28/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 10/28/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/28/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 10/28/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 10/28/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 10/28/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 10/28/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 10/28/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/28/2019
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 10/28/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 10/31/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/31/2019
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 10/31/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 11/13/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 11/13/2019
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 11/13/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 11/13/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 11/13/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 11/13/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 11/13/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 11/13/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 11/13/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/19/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/19/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 01/14/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/14/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 01/14/2020
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 01/14/2020
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 01/14/2020
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/14/2020
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 01/15/2020
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 01/15/2020
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 01/15/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure10/16/2019 Referred to
House Transportation Subcommittee on Highways and Transit10/17/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4697. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/16/2019)

End the Limo Loophole Act

This bill revises the definition of commercial motor vehicle to include vehicles that are designed to transport 9 or more passengers including the driver (currently, at least 16 passengers including the driver) and requires the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration to finalize a rulemaking to require states to implement an annual inspection program for commercial passenger-carrying vehicles.