There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

SAFE Limos Act
Safety, Accountability, and Federal Enforcement of Limos Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish safety standards for certain limousines, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
10/16/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
10/31/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8682)
Action By: House of Representatives
10/17/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/16/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/16/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (98)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 10/18/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 10/18/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 10/18/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/21/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 10/22/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 10/22/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 10/22/2019
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 10/22/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 10/22/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 10/22/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/22/2019
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 10/22/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 10/22/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/30/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 10/30/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 10/30/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 10/30/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/30/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 10/30/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 10/30/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/30/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 10/30/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 10/30/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 10/30/2019
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 10/30/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 10/30/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/31/2019
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 11/08/2019
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 11/08/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 11/08/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 11/08/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 11/08/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 11/08/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 11/08/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 11/08/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 11/08/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 11/08/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/15/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/18/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/07/2020
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 01/09/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 01/09/2020
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 01/14/2020
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 01/14/2020
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 01/14/2020
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 01/14/2020
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/14/2020
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 01/14/2020
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 01/14/2020
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 01/17/2020
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 01/17/2020
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 01/17/2020
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 01/17/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 01/17/2020
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 01/17/2020
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 01/17/2020
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 01/17/2020
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 01/17/2020
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 02/10/2020
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/10/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/10/2020
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 02/10/2020
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 02/10/2020
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 02/10/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. [D-IL-4] 02/10/2020
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 02/10/2020
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/10/2020
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 02/10/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 02/12/2020
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 02/12/2020
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 02/12/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 02/27/2020
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 02/27/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 03/04/2020
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 03/04/2020
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/04/2020
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/04/2020
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 03/05/2020
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/05/2020
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/09/2020
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 03/09/2020
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 03/09/2020
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 03/12/2020
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 03/12/2020
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/12/2020
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/12/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 03/12/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/12/2020
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/11/2020
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/11/2020
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 06/11/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/18/2020
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 06/18/2020
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/18/2020
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/18/2020
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/22/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce10/16/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce10/17/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4708. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/16/2019)

Safety, Accountability, and Federal Enforcement of Limos Act of 2019 or the SAFE Limos Act

This bill establishes safety standards for stretch limousines.

Among other requirements, the bill requires

  • safety belts to be installed in stretch limousines with a gross vehicle weight rating greater than 8,500 pounds at each designated seating position, including on side-facing seats;
  • the Department of Transportation (DOT) to develop and issue guidelines, best practices, and recommendations to assist stretch limousine alterers develop and administer a vehicle modifier plan;
  • DOT to complete research into side impact protection, roof crush resistance, and air bag systems for the protection of occupants in stretch limousines given alternative seating positions or interior configurations, including perimeter seating arrangements;
  • stretch limousine operators to disclose (1) the date of the most recent inspection of the limousine required under state or federal law, (2) the results of the inspection, and (3) any corrective actions taken to ensure the limousine passes inspection; and
  • the use of event data recorders in stretch limousines.