There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Take Unsafe Limos Off the Road Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Transportation to award grants to States that have enacted and are enforcing certain laws with respect to stretch limousines, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
10/16/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
10/31/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8682)
Action By: House of Representatives
10/17/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/16/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/16/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (98)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 10/18/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 10/18/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 10/18/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/21/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 10/22/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 10/22/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 10/22/2019
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 10/22/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 10/22/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 10/22/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/22/2019
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 10/22/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 10/22/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/30/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 10/30/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 10/30/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 10/30/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/30/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 10/30/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 10/30/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/30/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 10/30/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 10/30/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 10/30/2019
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 10/30/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 10/30/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/31/2019
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 11/08/2019
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 11/08/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 11/08/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 11/08/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 11/08/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 11/08/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 11/08/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 11/08/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 11/08/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 11/08/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/15/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/18/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/07/2020
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 01/09/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 01/09/2020
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 01/14/2020
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 01/14/2020
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 01/14/2020
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 01/14/2020
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/14/2020
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 01/14/2020
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 01/14/2020
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 01/17/2020
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 01/17/2020
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 01/17/2020
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 01/17/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 01/17/2020
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 01/17/2020
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 01/17/2020
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 01/17/2020
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 01/17/2020
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 02/10/2020
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/10/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/10/2020
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 02/10/2020
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 02/10/2020
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 02/10/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. [D-IL-4] 02/10/2020
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 02/10/2020
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/10/2020
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 02/10/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 02/12/2020
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 02/12/2020
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 02/12/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 02/27/2020
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 02/27/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 03/04/2020
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 03/04/2020
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/04/2020
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/04/2020
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 03/05/2020
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/05/2020
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/09/2020
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 03/09/2020
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 03/09/2020
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 03/12/2020
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 03/12/2020
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/12/2020
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/12/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 03/12/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/12/2020
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/11/2020
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/11/2020
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 06/11/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/18/2020
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 06/18/2020
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/18/2020
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/18/2020
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/22/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce10/16/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce10/17/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4709. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/16/2019)

Take Unsafe Limos Off the Road Act

This bill directs the Department of Transportation to award grants to states that have enacted and are enforcing laws that require the impoundment or immobilization of stretch limousines if such limousines are found to have certain defects upon inspection.