There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Support UNFPA Funding Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize contributions to the United Nations Population Fund, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
10/17/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
10/17/2019Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/17/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (125)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 10/17/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 10/17/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/17/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 10/17/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 10/17/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 10/17/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 10/28/2019
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 10/28/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/28/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 10/28/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/28/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 10/28/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 10/28/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 11/12/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 11/12/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 11/12/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 11/13/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 11/13/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/14/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 11/14/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 11/14/2019
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 11/21/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 11/21/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 11/21/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 11/21/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 12/06/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 12/17/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 01/27/2020
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 08/25/2020
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 09/17/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs10/17/2019 Referred to

As of 12/05/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4722 - Support UNFPA Funding Act


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4722. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/17/2019)

Support UNFPA Funding Act

This bill authorizes annual contributions to support the core functions and programs of the United Nations Population Fund for the five fiscal years following the bill's enactment.