There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Fish Act of 2019
Salmon Focused Investments in Sustainable Habitats Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the identification of salmon conservation areas, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/17/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
01/14/2020Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife
11/13/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
11/08/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
10/17/2019Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/17/2019Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/17/2019Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/17/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources10/17/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife11/13/2019 Referred to
01/14/2020 Hearings by
House Agriculture10/17/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry11/08/2019 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs10/17/2019 Referred to

As of 01/21/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4723 - Fish Act of 2019


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.