There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Synthetic Opioid Exposure Prevention and Training Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Synthetic Opioid Exposure Prevention and Training Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Synthetic Opioid Exposure Prevention and Training Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to protect U.S. Customs and Border Protection officers, agents, other personnel, and canines against potential synthetic opioid exposure, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
12/09/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 393 - 0 (Roll no. 656).(text: CR H9369)
12/03/2019Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
12/03/2019Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-318, Part I.
10/18/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
12/10/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
12/09/2019-7:11pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/09/2019-7:11pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 393 - 0 (Roll no. 656). (text: CR H9369)
12/09/2019-7:02pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9381-9382)
12/09/2019-4:25pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/09/2019-4:17pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4739.
12/09/2019-4:17pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9369-9370)
12/09/2019-4:17pmHouseMs. Clarke (NY) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/03/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 259.
12/03/2019HouseCommittee on Ways and Means discharged.
12/03/2019HouseReported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-318, Part I.
10/23/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
10/23/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
10/18/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
10/18/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
10/18/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
10/18/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security10/18/2019 Referred to
10/23/2019 Markup by
12/03/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-318
House Ways and Means10/18/2019 Referred to
12/03/2019 Discharged from
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade10/18/2019 Referred to
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs12/10/2019 Referred to

As of 02/20/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4739 - Synthetic Opioid Exposure Prevention and Training Act


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4739. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (12/09/2019)

Synthetic Opioid Exposure Prevention and Training Act

This bill directs the U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP) to implement a safety framework to protect its personnel from exposure to potential synthetic opioids.

Among other things, the CBP must do the following:

  • issue a policy that specifies protocols and procedures for the safe handling of potential synthetic opioids;
  • require mandatory training on (1) the potential risk of exposure to and safe handling procedures for synthetic opioids, and (2) how to administer opioid receptor antagonists (e.g., naloxone) after exposure; and
  • provide personal protective equipment and opioid receptor antagonists to officers, agents, other personnel, and canines at risk of exposure to synthetic opioids.