There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Taiwan Allies International Protection and Enhancement Initiative (TAIPEI) Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To express United States support for Taiwan's diplomatic alliances around the world.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
10/18/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
10/30/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
10/30/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
10/18/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/18/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/18/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 10/18/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 10/18/2019
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 10/18/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 10/18/2019
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/23/2019
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 10/23/2019
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 10/23/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 10/28/2019
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/28/2019
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 10/28/2019
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/28/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 10/28/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6] 10/28/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 10/28/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 10/28/2019
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/28/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/28/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 10/28/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/28/2019
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 10/28/2019
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/28/2019
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 10/28/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/28/2019
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 10/28/2019
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 10/28/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 10/28/2019
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 10/29/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 10/29/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 10/29/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 10/29/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 10/29/2019
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10] 10/29/2019
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19] 10/29/2019
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 10/29/2019
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 10/29/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 10/30/2019
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 11/01/2019
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 11/05/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 11/05/2019
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 11/05/2019
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 11/12/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 11/12/2019
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 11/15/2019
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 11/15/2019
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 11/20/2019
Rep. Cloud, Michael [R-TX-27] 12/17/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 01/29/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs10/18/2019 Referred to
10/30/2019 Markup by
House Ways and Means10/18/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4754. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/18/2019)

Taiwan Allies International Protection and Enhancement Initiative (TAIPEI) Act of 2019

This bill requires the Department of State to consult with Congress before decreasing or increasing U.S. government engagement with another nation as a result of that nation's decision to strengthen or undermine ties with Taiwan. (Taiwan is self-governing, but China considers it a renegade province and has taken actions to encourage countries and international organizations to limit or cut off relations with Taiwan.)

The bill states that the U.S. government should support Taiwan in strengthening its relationships with countries around the world.