Text: H.R.4763 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/18/2019)


116th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 4763


To extend the limited wraparound coverage pilot program for an additional 5 years, and for other purposes.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

October 18, 2019

Ms. Kaptur (for herself, Mr. Ryan, Mrs. Beatty, Ms. Fudge, Mr. Gibbs, Mr. Stivers, Mr. Gonzalez of Ohio, and Mr. Joyce of Ohio) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce


A BILL

To extend the limited wraparound coverage pilot program for an additional 5 years, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Wraparound Health Coverage Protection Act”.

SEC. 2. Extension of limited wraparound coverage pilot program for additional 5 years.

The provisions of paragraph (b)(3)(vii) of section 146.145 of title 45, Code of Federal Regulations (as in effect on the date of enactment of this Act), shall apply to limited wraparound coverage (as described in such provisions) that, with respect to health insurance coverage described in paragraph (b)(3)(vii)(D)(1) or (b)(3)(vii)(D)(2) of such section (as such paragraphs are in effect on such date of enactment)—

(1) is first offered no earlier than January 1, 2016, and no later than December 31, 2023; and

(2) ends no later than on the later of—

(A) December 31, 2024; or

(B) the date on which the last employment agreement relating to such health insurance coverage terminates after the date on which such limited wraparound coverage is first offered under paragraph (1) (determined without regard to any extension agreed to after the date on which such limited wraparound coverage is so first offered).


Share This