There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

TRANSPLANT Act of 2020
Timely ReAuthorization of Necessary Stem-cell Programs Lends Access to Needed Therapies Act of 2020

Short Titles as Reported to House

TRANSPLANT Act of 2019
Timely ReAuthorization of Necessary Stem-cell Programs Lends Access to Needed Therapies Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

TRANSPLANT Act of 2019
Timely ReAuthorization of Necessary Stem-cell Programs Lends Access to Needed Therapies Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize the Stem Cell Therapeutic and Research Act of 2005, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/30/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 0 (Roll no. 211).
09/29/2020Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-549.
10/18/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/01/2020SenateReceived in the Senate.
09/30/2020-4:28pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/30/2020-4:28pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 0 (Roll no. 211). (text: CR 09/29/2020 H4996)
09/30/2020-3:45pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5089-5090)
09/29/2020-2:15pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/29/2020-2:06pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4764.
09/29/2020-2:06pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4996-4998)
09/29/2020-2:06pmHouseMr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/29/2020HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 449.
09/29/2020HouseReported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-549.
09/09/2020HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/09/2020HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/21/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/18/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
10/18/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (52)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 10/18/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 10/18/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 10/22/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/23/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 10/23/2019
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/28/2019
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/28/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 11/12/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 11/12/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 11/19/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/20/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/03/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 12/03/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 12/04/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 12/17/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 12/19/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 01/16/2020
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 02/04/2020
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 02/05/2020
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/05/2020
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 02/07/2020
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/13/2020
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 02/18/2020
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 02/26/2020
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 02/28/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/13/2020
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 03/13/2020
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 03/13/2020
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6] 05/22/2020
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 07/01/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/13/2020
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 07/16/2020
Rep. Tiffany, Thomas P. [R-WI-7] 07/16/2020
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/16/2020
Rep. Stanton, Greg [D-AZ-9] 07/16/2020
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 07/21/2020
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 07/22/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 07/22/2020
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 07/27/2020
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 07/27/2020
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/27/2020
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 07/29/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 08/14/2020
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 08/14/2020
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 08/28/2020
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 09/11/2020
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/11/2020
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 09/11/2020
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 09/11/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 09/11/2020
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/17/2020
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 09/29/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce10/18/2019 Referred to
09/09/2020 Markup by
09/29/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-549
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health10/21/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4764. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (09/30/2020)

Timely ReAuthorization of Necessary Stem-cell Programs Lends Access to Needed Therapies Act of 2020 or the TRANSPLANT Act of 2020

This bill modifies and reauthorizes through FY2025 the C.W. Bill Young Cell Transplantation Program, which provides support to patients who need a potentially life-saving bone marrow transplant or umbilical cord blood transplant. It also requires research and other activities related to stem cell therapies.

Specifically, the Department of Health and Human Services must conduct a periodic review of the science of using adult stem cells and birthing tissues in therapeutic treatments, and the National Institutes of Health must continue efforts to further the field of regenerative medicine using adult stem cells.

In addition, the Government Accountability Office must examine various issues related to the national blood stem cell workforce.