There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

VA Tele-Hearing Modernization Act

Short Titles as Introduced

VA Tele-Hearing Modernization Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To amend title 38, United States Code, to permit appellants to appear in cases before the Board of Veterans' Appeals by picture and voice transmission from locations other than facilities of the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to permit appellants to appear in disability compensation cases before the Board of Veterans' Appeals by picture and voice transmission from locations other than facilities of the Department of Veterans Affairs.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
11/12/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
10/21/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
11/13/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
11/12/2019-4:47pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
11/12/2019-4:47pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H8753-8754)
11/12/2019-4:47pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
11/12/2019-4:38pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4771.
11/12/2019-4:38pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8753-8755)
11/12/2019-4:38pmHouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/08/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
10/29/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
10/29/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
10/21/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
10/21/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24]* 10/21/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs10/21/2019 Referred to
10/29/2019 Markup by
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs11/08/2019 Referred to
Senate Veterans' Affairs11/13/2019 Referred to

As of 01/23/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4771 - VA Tele-Hearing Modernization Act


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.