There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

VA Tele-Hearing Modernization Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

VA Tele-Hearing Modernization Act

Short Titles as Introduced

VA Tele-Hearing Modernization Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

VA Tele-Hearing Modernization Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To amend title 38, United States Code, to permit appellants to appear in cases before the Board of Veterans' Appeals by picture and voice transmission from locations other than facilities of the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to permit appellants to appear in disability compensation cases before the Board of Veterans' Appeals by picture and voice transmission from locations other than facilities of the Department of Veterans Affairs.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
04/10/2020Became Public Law No: 116-137. (TXT | PDF)
04/10/2020Signed by President.
04/03/2020Presented to President.
03/26/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
03/26/2020Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
11/12/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
10/21/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
04/10/2020Became Public Law No: 116-137. (TXT | PDF)
04/10/2020Signed by President.
04/03/2020HousePresented to President.
03/26/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/26/2020SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
03/26/2020SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2158)
11/13/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
11/12/2019-4:47pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
11/12/2019-4:47pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H8753-8754)
11/12/2019-4:47pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
11/12/2019-4:38pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4771.
11/12/2019-4:38pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8753-8755)
11/12/2019-4:38pmHouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/08/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
10/29/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
10/29/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
10/21/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
10/21/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24]* 10/21/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs10/21/2019 Referred to
10/29/2019 Markup by
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs11/08/2019 Referred to
Senate Veterans' Affairs11/13/2019 Referred to
03/26/2020 Discharged from

As of 08/07/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4771 - VA Tele-Hearing Modernization Act


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.4771. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-137 (04/10/2020)

VA Tele-Hearing Modernization Act

This bill authorizes appellants in cases before the Board of Veterans' Appeals to appear at a hearing by picture and voice transmission (e.g., Skype) from locations other than Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) facilities. The bill requires the VA to report specified statistics and information related to hearings held by picture and voice transmission.