There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To extend the Undertaking Spam, Spyware, And Fraud Enforcement With Enforcers beyond Borders Act of 2006, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
10/20/2020Became Public Law No: 116-173. (TXT | PDF)
10/20/2020Signed by President.
10/09/2020Presented to President.
09/24/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
09/24/2020Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
12/16/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H10286)
12/16/2019Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-351.
10/22/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/20/2020Became Public Law No: 116-173. (TXT | PDF)
10/20/2020Signed by President.
10/09/2020HousePresented to President.
09/29/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/24/2020SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
09/24/2020SenateSenate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5851-5852)
12/17/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
12/16/2019-4:18pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/16/2019-4:18pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10286)
12/16/2019-4:12pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4779.
12/16/2019-4:12pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10286-10287)
12/16/2019-4:11pmHouseMs. Schakowsky moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
12/16/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 280.
12/16/2019HouseReported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-351.
11/20/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/20/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/14/2019HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce
10/24/2019HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce
10/23/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/22/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
10/22/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce10/22/2019 Referred to
11/20/2019 Markup by
12/16/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-351
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce10/23/2019 Referred to
10/24/2019 Hearings by
11/14/2019 Reported by
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation12/17/2019 Referred to
09/24/2020 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.4779. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-173 (10/20/2020)

This bill reauthorizes through FY2027 the U.S. SAFE WEB Act of 2006, which permits the Federal Trade Commission (FTC) to take certain actions to protect consumers from cross-border fraud and deception occurring over the internet. The bill further requires the FTC to report on its activities concerning cross-border, online fraud and provide any policy recommendations to address such fraud.