Text: H.R.4779 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-173 (10/20/2020)

 
[116th Congress Public Law 173]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]



[[Page 134 STAT. 837]]

Public Law 116-173
116th Congress

                                 An Act


 
  To extend the Undertaking Spam, Spyware, And Fraud Enforcement With 
          Enforcers beyond Borders Act of 2006, and for other 
            purposes. <<NOTE: Oct. 20, 2020 -  [H.R. 4779]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,
SECTION 1. EXTENSION OF THE U.S. SAFE WEB ACT OF 2006.

    Section 13 of the U.S. SAFE WEB Act of 2006 (Public Law 109-455; 15 
U.S.C. 44 note) is amended by striking ``September 30, 2020'' and 
inserting ``September 30, 2027''.
SEC. 2. REPORT.

    Not later than 3 years after the date of the enactment of this Act, 
the Federal Trade Commission shall transmit to the Committee on Energy 
and Commerce of the House of Representatives and the Committee on 
Commerce, Science, and Transportation of the Senate a report describing 
its use of and experience with the authority granted by the U.S. SAFE 
WEB Act of 2006 (Public Law 109-455) and the amendments made by such 
Act. The report shall include--
            (1) the number of cross-border complaints received and acted 
        upon by the Commission;
            (2) identification of the foreign agencies with which the 
        Commission has cooperated and the results of such cooperation, 
        including any foreign agency enforcement action or lack thereof;
            (3) a description of Commission litigation brought in 
        foreign courts and the results of such litigation; and
            (4) <<NOTE: Recommenda- tions.>>  any recommendations for 
        legislation that may advance the mission of the Commission in 
        carrying out the U.S. SAFE WEB Act of 2006 and the amendments 
        made by such Act.
SEC. 3. DETERMINATION OF BUDGETARY EFFECTS.

    The budgetary effects of this Act, for the purpose of complying with 
the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010, shall be determined by 
reference to the latest statement titled ``Budgetary Effects of PAYGO 
Legislation'' for this Act, submitted for printing in the

[[Page 134 STAT. 838]]

Congressional Record by the Chairman of the House Budget Committee, 
provided that such statement has been submitted prior to the vote on 
passage.

    Approved October 20, 2020.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 4779 (S. 3132):
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

HOUSE REPORTS: No. 116-351 (Comm. on Energy and Commerce).
SENATE REPORTS: No. 116-256 (Comm. on Commerce, Science, and 
Transportation) accompanying S. 3132.
CONGRESSIONAL RECORD:
                                                        Vol. 165 (2019):
                                    Dec. 16, considered and passed 
                                        House.
                                                        Vol. 166 (2020):
                                    Sept. 24, considered and passed 
                                        Senate.

                                  <all>

Share This