Text: H.R.4840 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Reported in House (12/15/2020)

Union Calendar No. 536

116th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 4840

[Report No. 116–652]


To modify the boundary of the Casa Grande Ruins National Monument, and for other purposes.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

October 23, 2019

Mr. O'Halleran (for himself, Mr. Gosar, Mrs. Kirkpatrick, Mr. Schweikert, Mr. Stanton, Mrs. Lesko, and Mr. Gallego) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Natural Resources

December 15, 2020

Additional sponsor: Mr. Grijalva

December 15, 2020

Reported with an amendment, committed to the Committee of the Whole House on the State of the Union, and ordered to be printed

[Strike out all after the enacting clause and insert the part printed in italic]

[For text of introduced bill, see copy of bill as introduced on October 23, 2019]


A BILL

To modify the boundary of the Casa Grande Ruins National Monument, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Casa Grande Ruins National Monument Boundary Modification Act of 2020”.

SEC. 2. Findings.

Congress finds that—

(1) Casa Grande Ruin Reservation was—

(A) set aside on March 2, 1889;

(B) proclaimed as the first archeological preserve in the Untied States on June 22, 1892; and

(C) redesignated as “Casa Grande Ruins National Monument” on August 3, 1918;

(2) Casa Grande Ruins National Monument protects one of the finest architectural examples of 14th Century Hohokam culture in the American Southwest known to early Spanish explorers as the “Great House”;

(3) Casa Grande is only part of the story of this ancient town that may have covered 2 square miles; and

(4) recent surveys and research have determined that the area of the Great House and the village surrounding it extends beyond the existing boundary of the Casa Grande Ruins National Monument.

SEC. 3. Definitions.

In this Act:

(1) BIA LAND.—The term “BIA land” means the approximately 7.41 acres of Federal land administered by the Bureau of Indian Affairs, to be transferred to the administrative jurisdiction of the National Park Service, as generally depicted on the map.

(2) BLM LAND PARCEL A.—The term “BLM land Parcel A” means the approximately 3.8 acres of Federal land administered by the Bureau of Land Management, for which administrative jurisdiction is to be transferred to the National Park Service, as generally depicted on the map.

(3) BLM LAND PARCEL B.—The term “BLM land Parcel B” means the approximately 3.7 acres of Federal land administered by the Bureau of Land Management for which administrative jurisdiction is to be transferred to the Bureau of Indian Affairs, as generally depicted on the map.

(4) MAP.—The term “map” means the map entitled “Casa Grande Ruins National Monument Proposed Boundary Adjustment”, numbered 303/120,734B, and dated June 2020.

(5) MONUMENT.—The term “Monument” means the Casa Grande Ruins National Monument in the State.

(6) NPS LAND.—The term “NPS land” means the approximately 3.5 acres of Federal land administered by the National Park Service, for which administrative jurisdiction is to be transferred to the Bureau of Indian Affairs, as generally depicted on the map.

(7) SECRETARY.—The term “Secretary” means the Secretary of the Interior.

(8) STATE.—The term “State” means the State of Arizona.

SEC. 4. Acquisition and transfer of administrative jurisdiction of lands.

(a) Acquisition of lands.—The Secretary may acquire by donation, exchange, or purchase with donated or appropriated funds from willing owners only, lands or interests in land generally depicted on the map as State land or private land, to be administered as part of the Monument.

(b) Transfer of administrative jurisdiction.—

(1) WITHDRAWAL.—The BIA land, BLM land parcel A and BLM land parcel B are withdrawn from—

(A) all forms of entry, appropriation, and disposal under the public land laws;

(B) location, entry, and patent under the mining laws; and

(C) operation of the mineral leasing and geothermal leasing laws and mineral materials laws.

(2) TRANSFER OF ADMINISTRATIVE JURISDICTION.—

(A) BLM LAND PARCEL A.—Administrative jurisdiction over the BLM land parcel A is transferred from the Bureau of Land Management to the National Park Service.

(B) BLM LAND PARCEL B.—Administrative jurisdiction over BLM land parcel B is transferred from the Bureau of Land Management to the Bureau of Indian Affairs.

(C) BIA LAND.—Administrative jurisdiction over the BIA land is transferred from the Bureau of Indian Affairs to the National Park Service.

(D) NPS LAND.—Administrative jurisdiction over the NPS land is transferred from the National Park Service to the Bureau of Indian Affairs.

(c) Administration; boundary modification.—Upon acquisition or transfer of land or an interest in land pursuant to subsection (a), and with respect to the lands transferred by subsection (b), the Secretary shall—

(1) administer any acquired land or interest in land, and transferred to the administrative jurisdiction of the National Park Service, as part of the Monument, in accordance with the laws generally applicable to units of the National Park System, including applicable provisions of division A of subtitle I of title 54, United States Code; and

(2) modify the boundary of the Monument to reflect the transfers of lands, and any acquired lands or interests in lands.

(d) Availability of map.—The map shall be on file and available for inspection in the appropriate offices of the National Park Service, U.S. Department of the Interior.

(e) Compensation.—Except in a case in which land or an interest in land is acquired by donation, as consideration for the acquisition of land or an interest in land under subsection (a), the Secretary shall—

(1) pay fair market value for such lands; or

(2) convey to the State convey to the State or private land owner, as applicable, Federal land or an interest in Federal land of equal value located in the State.

SEC. 5. Administration of State trust lands.

The Secretary may enter into an agreement with the State to provide for cooperative management by the Secretary and the State of the approximately 200 acres of State land, as generally depicted on the map.


Union Calendar No. 536

116th CONGRESS
     2d Session
H. R. 4840
[Report No. 116–652]

A BILL
To modify the boundary of the Casa Grande Ruins National Monument, and for other purposes.

December 15, 2020
Reported with an amendment, committed to the Committee of the Whole House on the State of the Union, and ordered to be printed
Share This