There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

EXPO Act of 2019
Expositions Provide Opportunities Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

EXPO Act of 2019
Expositions Provide Opportunities Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Secretary of State to provide funds for a United States pavilion at Expo 2020 Dubai, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
10/29/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8585)
10/23/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/06/2019SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 291.
11/05/2019SenateRead the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
10/30/2019SenateReceived in the Senate.
10/29/2019-5:57pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/29/2019-5:57pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8585)
10/29/2019-5:46pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4842.
10/29/2019-5:46pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8585-8587)
10/29/2019-5:46pmHouseMr. Phillips moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/23/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
10/23/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (11)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs10/23/2019 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4842.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4842. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (10/29/2019)

Expositions Provide Opportunities Act of 2019 or EXPO Act of 2019

This bill authorizes the Department of State to provide funds for a pavilion at Expo 2020 Dubai. Before providing such funds, the State Department shall notify Congress. The notification shall contain information on various related topics, including the source of such funds, an analysis of the human rights record of the United Arab Emirates (UAE), and a certification that each entity receiving such funds is not (1) in violation of UAE labor laws, (2) utilizing a victim of trafficking, or (3) in violation of any applicable anti-corruption laws.

The funds shall be made available on a cost-matching basis from sources other than the U.S. government, to the maximum extent practicable.

The State Department shall report to Congress within 180 days after the opening of the pavilion on (1) the number of participating U.S. businesses, and (2) the amount and source of any obtained matching funds.