There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Global Child Thrive Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To develop and implement policies to advance early childhood development, to provide assistance for orphans and other vulnerable children in developing countries, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
10/28/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
12/18/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
12/18/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
10/28/2019Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/28/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (61)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 10/28/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 10/28/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 10/28/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 10/28/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 10/30/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 10/30/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 11/08/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 11/08/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/08/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 11/08/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/14/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/14/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 11/20/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/20/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 11/20/2019
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 11/21/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 12/03/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/03/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 12/04/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 12/04/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 12/04/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 12/09/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/09/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 12/09/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 12/10/2019
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 12/10/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 12/10/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 12/13/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 12/13/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 12/13/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 12/13/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/13/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 12/13/2019
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 12/17/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/17/2019
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19] 12/17/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 12/18/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 12/23/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 12/23/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 01/13/2020
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 01/13/2020
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 01/24/2020
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 01/24/2020
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 01/28/2020
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 01/28/2020
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6] 02/10/2020
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 02/14/2020
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 02/14/2020
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/18/2020
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 03/09/2020
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 03/12/2020
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/15/2020
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 05/15/2020
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/15/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/15/2020
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/15/2020
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 05/15/2020
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 05/15/2020
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 05/27/2020
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 07/13/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/21/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs10/28/2019 Referred to
12/18/2019 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4864. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/28/2019)

Global Child Thrive Act of 2019

This bill reauthorizes for FY2020-FY2025 programs to provide assistance to orphans and other vulnerable children in developing countries. The bill also requires the U.S. Agency for International Development to direct relevant executive branch agencies to incorporate early childhood development into current programs and promote inclusive early childhood development in partner countries.

Such actions to promote early childhood development shall build on existing U.S. plans and strategies and aim to (1) prevent unnecessary family-child separation, (2) assist families with children with disabilities, and (3) help countries transition from child care protection systems that rely on residential care (such as orphanages and children's homes) to ones focused on family-based care.