There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Homeland Security Counterintelligence Threat Reduction Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a Department of Homeland Security counterintelligence vetting task force, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
10/28/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
11/14/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
11/14/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Intelligence and Counterterrorism.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
10/28/2019Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/28/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 12/04/2019
Rep. Guest, Michael [R-MS-3] 12/10/2019
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 12/18/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 02/03/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security10/28/2019 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Intelligence and Counterterrorism11/14/2019 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability11/14/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.