There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Heartbeat Protection Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to prohibit abortion in cases where a fetal heartbeat is detectable.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/11/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
01/11/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/11/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/11/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (89)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Cloud, Michael [R-TX-27]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-16]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 01/11/2019
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 01/15/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 01/15/2019
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 01/15/2019
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 01/16/2019
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15] 01/16/2019
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 01/16/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/16/2019
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 02/06/2019
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 02/13/2019
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/22/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6] 02/28/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 03/05/2019
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 03/11/2019
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/17/2019
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17] 06/12/2019
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/16/2019
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 07/25/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/11/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security01/11/2019 Referred to

As of 09/19/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.490 - Heartbeat Protection Act of 2019


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.490. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/11/2019)

Heartbeat Protection Act of 2019

This bill makes it a crime for a physician to knowingly perform an abortion (1) without determining whether the fetus has a detectable heartbeat, (2) without informing the mother of the results, or (3) after determining that a fetus has a detectable heartbeat.

It provides an exception for an abortion that is necessary to save the life of a mother whose life is endangered by a physical (but not psychological or emotional) disorder, illness, or condition.

A physician who performs a prohibited abortion is subject to criminal penalties—a fine, up to five years in prison, or both.

A woman who undergoes a prohibited abortion may not be prosecuted for violating or conspiring to violate the provisions of this bill.