There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Down Syndrome Discrimination by Abortion Prohibition Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to prohibit discrimination by abortion against an unborn child on the basis of Down syndrome.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
10/29/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
12/18/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
10/29/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/29/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5]* 10/29/2019
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 10/29/2019
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12]* 10/29/2019
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 10/29/2019
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3]* 10/29/2019
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 10/29/2019
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 10/29/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1]* 10/29/2019
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large]* 10/29/2019
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 10/29/2019
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1]* 10/29/2019
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 10/29/2019
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 10/29/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 10/29/2019
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 10/29/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1]* 10/29/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 10/29/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 10/29/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5]* 10/29/2019
Rep. Roy, Chip [R-TX-21]* 10/29/2019
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 10/29/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8]* 10/29/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2]* 10/29/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 10/29/2019
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 10/29/2019
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 10/29/2019
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 10/29/2019
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 10/29/2019
Rep. Cline, Ben [R-VA-6]* 10/29/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 10/29/2019
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 10/29/2019
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4]* 10/29/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 11/05/2019
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15] 11/05/2019
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 11/05/2019
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/12/2019
Rep. Murphy, Gregory [R-NC-3] 11/12/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6] 11/12/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/12/2019
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 11/12/2019
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-16] 11/12/2019
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 11/12/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/14/2019
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 11/14/2019
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 11/21/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 11/21/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 11/21/2019
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 12/06/2019
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 12/06/2019
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 12/06/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 01/16/2020
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 01/16/2020
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 01/16/2020
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 01/16/2020
Rep. Green, Mark E. [R-TN-7] 01/16/2020
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6] 07/22/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary10/29/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security12/18/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4903. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/29/2019)

Down Syndrome Discrimination by Abortion Prohibition Act

This bill creates new federal crimes related to the performance of an abortion on an unborn child who has Down syndrome.

It subjects a violator to criminal penalties—a fine, a prison term of up to five years, or both.

It also authorizes civil remedies, including damages and injunctive relief.

A woman who undergoes such an abortion may not be prosecuted or held civilly liable.