There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Department of Veterans Affairs Contracting Preference Consistency Act of 2020

Other Short Titles

Department of Veterans Affairs Contracting Preference Consistency Act of 2020

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Department of Veterans Affairs Contracting Preference Consistency Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Department of Veterans Affairs Contracting Preference Consistency Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Department of Veterans Affairs Contracting Preference Consistency Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for an exception to certain small business contracting requirements applicable to the Department of Veterans Affairs procurement of certain goods and services covered under the Ability One program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
08/08/2020Became Public Law No: 116-155. (TXT | PDF)
08/08/2020Signed by President.
07/28/2020Presented to President.
07/20/2020Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.(text: CR H3110)
03/12/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S1746)
03/12/2020Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
12/16/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H10270)
10/30/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/08/2020Became Public Law No: 116-155. (TXT | PDF)
08/08/2020Signed by President.
07/28/2020HousePresented to President.
07/20/2020-1:20pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/20/2020-1:20pmHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H3110)
07/20/2020-1:20pmHouseMr. Takano asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table the bill, H.R. 4920, and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H3110-3111)
03/16/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/12/2020SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S1746)
03/12/2020SenateS.Amdt.1555 Amendment SA 1555 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
03/12/2020SenateS.Amdt.1555 Amendment SA 1555 proposed by Senator Murkowski for Senator Tester. (consideration: CR S1746; text: CR S1746) In the nature of a substitute.
03/12/2020SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1746)
03/12/2020SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
12/17/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
12/16/2019-2:58pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/16/2019-2:58pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10270)
12/16/2019-2:46pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4920.
12/16/2019-2:46pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10270-10271)
12/16/2019-2:46pmHouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/05/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
12/05/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
12/05/2019HouseSubcommittee on Oversight and Investigations Discharged.
11/08/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
10/30/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
10/30/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (18)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs10/30/2019 Referred to
12/05/2019 Markup by
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations11/08/2019 Referred to
12/05/2019 Discharged from
Senate Veterans' Affairs12/17/2019 Referred to
03/12/2020 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (0)

With the start of a new Congress, summaries from prior Congresses may be delayed or abbreviated.