There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Department of Veterans Affairs Contracting Preference Consistency Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Department of Veterans Affairs Contracting Preference Consistency Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for an exception to certain small business contracting requirements applicable to the Department of Veterans Affairs procurement of certain goods and services covered under the Ability One program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
12/16/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H10270)
10/30/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
12/17/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
12/16/2019-2:58pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/16/2019-2:58pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10270)
12/16/2019-2:46pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4920.
12/16/2019-2:46pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10270-10271)
12/16/2019-2:46pmHouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/05/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
12/05/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
12/05/2019HouseSubcommittee on Oversight and Investigations Discharged.
11/08/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
10/30/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
10/30/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs10/30/2019 Referred to
12/05/2019 Markup by
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations11/08/2019 Referred to
12/05/2019 Discharged from
Senate Veterans' Affairs12/17/2019 Referred to

As of 02/27/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4920 - Department of Veterans Affairs Contracting Preference Consistency Act


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.