There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Native American Child Protection Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Native American Child Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Indian Child Protection and Family Violence Prevention Act.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/21/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
09/08/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-493.
10/31/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date All Actions
09/21/2020-12:40pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/21/2020-12:39pmOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4560-4561)
Action By: House of Representatives
09/21/2020-12:36pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4957.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/21/2020-12:36pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4560-4562)
Action By: House of Representatives
09/21/2020-12:35pmMs. Haaland moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/08/2020Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 395.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/08/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-493.
12/05/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/05/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/05/2019Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged.
11/13/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indigenous Peoples of the United States
11/06/2019Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
10/31/2019Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/31/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (11)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources10/31/2019 Referred to
12/05/2019 Markup by
09/08/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-493
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indigenous Peoples of the United States11/06/2019 Referred to
11/13/2019 Hearings by
12/05/2019 Discharged from

As of 09/22/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4957 - Native American Child Protection Act


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.