There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Rural STEM Education Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Rural STEM Education Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Rural STEM Education Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Director of the National Science Foundation to support STEM education and workforce development research focused on rural areas, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/16/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
02/13/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 116-397.
11/05/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/17/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
09/16/2020-12:59pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/16/2020-12:59pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4463-4466)
09/16/2020-12:41pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4979.
09/16/2020-12:41pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4463-4467)
09/16/2020-12:40pmHouseMs. Johnson (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
02/13/2020HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 319.
02/13/2020HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 116-397.
11/14/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
11/14/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
11/05/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
11/05/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McAdams, Ben [D-UT-4]* 11/05/2019
Rep. Baird, James R. [R-IN-4]* 11/05/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 11/05/2019
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 11/05/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5]* 11/05/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 11/05/2019
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12]* 11/05/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5]* 11/05/2019
Rep. Murphy, Gregory [R-NC-3]* 11/05/2019
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1]* 11/05/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16]* 11/05/2019
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6]* 11/05/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 11/13/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 11/13/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 11/13/2019
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 11/13/2019
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 11/13/2019
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 11/13/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 11/13/2019
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/06/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 12/06/2019
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 12/06/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 12/06/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/06/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 12/06/2019
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 12/06/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 12/06/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 12/06/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/19/2019
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 12/19/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 12/19/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 12/19/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 01/13/2020
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 01/13/2020
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 01/24/2020
Rep. Hagedorn, Jim [R-MN-1] 01/24/2020
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 01/24/2020
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/24/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 01/24/2020
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 01/24/2020
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 01/24/2020
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 01/24/2020
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 01/24/2020
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 01/24/2020
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 01/27/2020
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 01/27/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science, Space, and Technology11/05/2019 Referred to
11/14/2019 Markup by
02/13/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-397
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions09/17/2020 Referred to

As of 10/31/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4979 - Rural STEM Education Act


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4979. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House (02/13/2020)

Rural STEM Education Act

This bill directs the National Science Foundation (NSF) to support research regarding STEM (science, technology, engineering, and mathematics, including computer science) education in rural schools.

The NSF must award grants to institutions of higher education or nonprofit organizations for (1) research and development to advance innovative approaches to support and sustain high-quality STEM teaching in rural schools, (2) research and development of programming to identify the barriers rural students face in accessing high-quality STEM education, (3) development of innovative solutions to improve the participation and advancement of rural students in grades Pre-K through 12 in STEM studies, and (4) research on online STEM education courses for rural communities.

The NSF may establish a pilot program of regional cohorts in rural areas to provide peer support, mentoring, and hands-on research experiences for rural STEM educators of students in grades Pre-K through 12 in order to build an ecosystem of cooperation among educators, researchers, academia, and local industry.

The NSF shall enter into an agreement with the National Academy of Sciences under which the National Academy agrees to evaluate aspects of STEM education and workforce development in rural areas.

The Government Accountability Office shall conduct a study on the engagement of rural populations in federal STEM programs.

Each of the federal agencies administering an Experimental Program to Stimulate Competitive Research (EPSCoR) program shall consider modifications to EPSCoR award structures to increase the capacity of rural communities to provide quality STEM education and STEM workforce development programming to students and teachers.

The bill expands certain outreach activities of the Manufacturing Extension Partnership (MEP) Program and MEP Centers to include secondary schools.

The National Institute of Standards and Technology must award prizes to stimulate research and development of creative technologies in order to deploy affordable and reliable broadband connectivity to underserved rural communities.

The Office of Science and Technology Policy must establish a broadband research and development working group to address national research challenges and opportunities for improving broadband access and adoption across the United States.