There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 2505 Derita Avenue in Charlotte, North Carolina, as the "Julius L. Chambers Civil Rights Memorial Post Office".


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
12/03/2020Became Public Law No: 116-202. (TXT | PDF)
12/03/2020Signed by President.
11/24/2020Presented to President.
11/18/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7081)
03/12/2020Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
02/05/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
11/05/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/03/2020Became Public Law No: 116-202. (TXT | PDF)
12/03/2020Signed by President.
11/24/2020HousePresented to President.
11/19/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/18/2020SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7081)
03/12/2020SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 450.
03/12/2020SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
03/11/2020SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/10/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
02/05/2020-4:36pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/05/2020-4:36pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H829)
02/05/2020-4:29pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4981.
02/05/2020-4:29pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H829-830)
02/05/2020-4:29pmHouseMrs. Lawrence moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/19/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Reform
11/05/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
11/05/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (12)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Reform11/05/2019 Referred to
12/19/2019 Markup by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs02/10/2020 Referred to
03/11/2020 Markup by
03/12/2020 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.4981.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4981. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-202 (12/03/2020)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 2505 Derita Avenue in Charlotte, North Carolina, as the "Julius L. Chambers Civil Rights Memorial Post Office."