There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Maternal Health Quality Improvement Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to improve obstetric care and maternal health outcomes, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/08/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
11/19/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
11/19/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
11/13/2019Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
11/13/2019Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
11/12/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/08/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/08/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives
09/09/2019Hearings Held Prior to Introduction and Referral.

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce11/08/2019 Referred to
11/12/2019 Referred to
09/09/2019 Hearings by
11/19/2019 Markup by
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health11/13/2019 Markup by
11/13/2019 Reported by

As of 12/07/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4995 - Maternal Health Quality Improvement Act of 2019


Subjects (0)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.