There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Maternal Health Quality Improvement Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Maternal Health Quality Improvement Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to improve obstetric care and maternal health outcomes, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/21/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
09/17/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-514.
11/08/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/22/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
09/21/2020-6:12pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/21/2020-6:12pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4623-4625)
09/21/2020-6:07pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4995.
09/21/2020-6:07pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4623-4626)
09/21/2020-6:07pmHouseMrs. Dingell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/17/2020HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 414.
09/17/2020HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-514.
11/19/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/19/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/13/2019HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
11/13/2019HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
11/12/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/08/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
11/08/2019HouseIntroduced in House
09/09/2019HouseHearings Held Prior to Introduction and Referral.

Cosponsors (31)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce11/08/2019 Referred to
11/12/2019 Referred to
09/09/2019 Hearings by
11/19/2019 Markup by
09/17/2020 Reported by
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health11/13/2019 Markup by
11/13/2019 Reported by
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions09/22/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4995. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House (09/17/2020)

Excellence in Maternal Health Act of 2019

This bill expands initiatives to address maternal health in rural areas and promote innovation in the field.

Specifically, the bill requires the Health Resources and Services Administration (HRSA) to establish rural obstetric networks for improving outcomes in birth and maternal morbidity through collaboration, training, and program evaluation.

HRSA also must award demonstration program grants to (1) train physicians, medical residents, and other practitioners to provide maternal and obstetric services in rural communities; and (2) support academic programs that develop or provide training to improve maternal care in rural areas. Further, the bill adds maternal health services as part of the telehealth network and telehealth resource centers grant programs.

The bill also makes a series of changes to the research and reporting requirements of the Department of Health and Human Services and the Government Accountability Office with respect to data on maternal health outcomes.

Additionally, the bill establishes grants to (1) develop best practices to reduce preventable maternal mortality; (2) train health care professionals about reducing and preventing discrimination when providing maternal health services; (3) support the collaboration of professionals across health settings with respect to maternal health; (4) establish evidence-informed, integrated health care services for pregnant and postpartum women and their infants.

HRSA also must contract with an independent research organization to study and make recommendations to accredited school training programs about discrimination and implicit and explicit biases.