Committees: H.R.4995 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce11/08/2019 Referred to
11/12/2019 Referred to
09/09/2019 Hearings by
11/19/2019 Markup by
09/17/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-514
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health11/13/2019 Markup by
11/13/2019 Reported by
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions09/22/2020 Referred to