There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Helping MOMS Act of 2020
Helping Medicaid Offer Maternity Services Act of 2020

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

Helping MOMS Act of 2019
Helping Medicaid Offer Maternity Services Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Helping MOMS Act of 2019
Helping Medicaid Offer Maternity Services Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XIX of the Social Security Act to provide for a State option under the Medicaid program to provide for and extend continuous coverage for certain individuals, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/29/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
09/21/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-527.
11/08/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/30/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
09/29/2020-2:41pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/29/2020-2:41pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5000-5001)
09/29/2020-2:31pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4996.
09/29/2020-2:31pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5000-5003)
09/29/2020-2:31pmHouseMr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/21/2020HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 428.
09/21/2020HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-527.
11/20/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/20/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/13/2019HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
11/13/2019HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
11/12/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/08/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
11/08/2019HouseIntroduced in House
09/09/2019HouseHearings Held Prior to Introduction and Referral.

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 11/08/2019
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14]* 11/08/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 11/08/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 11/08/2019
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1]* 11/08/2019
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 11/13/2019
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 11/14/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 11/14/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 11/15/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 11/20/2019
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 11/20/2019
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 11/20/2019
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 11/22/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/22/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 11/22/2019
Rep. Cunningham, Joe [D-SC-1] 12/09/2019
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/10/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/19/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/19/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/15/2020
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 01/15/2020
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 01/15/2020
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 01/15/2020
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 01/15/2020
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 01/27/2020
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 01/30/2020
Rep. Fletcher, Lizzie [D-TX-7] 02/18/2020
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 02/18/2020
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [R-NJ-2] 03/12/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/12/2020
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 03/12/2020
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 05/08/2020
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/08/2020
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 07/09/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 08/21/2020
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 08/21/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce11/08/2019 Referred to
09/09/2019 Hearings by
11/20/2019 Markup by
09/21/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-527
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health11/12/2019 Referred to
11/13/2019 Markup by
11/13/2019 Reported by
Senate Finance09/30/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4996. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (09/29/2020)

Helping Medicaid Offer Maternity Services Act of 2020 or the Helping MOMS Act of 2020

This bill allows states to provide one year of postpartum coverage under Medicaid and the Children's Health Insurance Program (CHIP). (Current law requires 60 days of postpartum coverage.) The Government Accountability Office must report on information relating to implementation.

Additionally, the Medicaid and CHIP Payment and Access Commission must report on specified information relating to coverage of doula services under state Medicaid programs, including coverage barriers and recommendations for improvement. The commission must also report on the use of bundled payments to reimburse providers for Medicaid pregnancy-related services.

The bill also eliminates the cap on the total rebate amount for single source and innovator multiple source drugs under the Medicaid Drug Rebate Program beginning on January 1, 2023, and increases the funds available for the Medicaid Improvement Fund for state activities relating to mechanized claims systems beginning in FY2022.