There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

United States Army Rangers Veterans of World War II Congressional Gold Medal Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To award a Congressional Gold Medal, collectively, to the United States Army Rangers Veterans of World War II in recognition of their extraordinary service during World War II.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
11/08/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
11/08/2019Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/08/2019Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/08/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (123)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6]* 11/08/2019
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6]* 11/08/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/14/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 11/14/2019
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/11/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 12/11/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 01/10/2020
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 01/10/2020
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 01/10/2020
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 01/10/2020
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 01/28/2020
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1] 01/28/2020
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 01/28/2020
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 01/28/2020
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 01/28/2020
Rep. Cunningham, Joe [D-SC-1] 01/28/2020
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 01/28/2020
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/28/2020
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/28/2020
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/28/2020
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 01/28/2020
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 01/28/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/28/2020
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-11] 01/28/2020
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 01/28/2020
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 01/29/2020
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 01/29/2020
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8] 01/29/2020
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 01/29/2020
Rep. Joyce, John [R-PA-13] 01/29/2020
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/29/2020
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 01/29/2020
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 01/30/2020
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 01/30/2020
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 01/30/2020
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 01/30/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/30/2020
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19] 01/30/2020
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/30/2020
Rep. Cloud, Michael [R-TX-27] 01/30/2020
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/30/2020
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 01/30/2020
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 01/30/2020
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/30/2020
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 02/04/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 02/04/2020
Rep. Roy, Chip [R-TX-21] 02/04/2020
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 02/04/2020
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 02/04/2020
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 02/05/2020
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 02/06/2020
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 02/06/2020
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 02/06/2020
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 02/06/2020
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 02/07/2020
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 02/07/2020
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 02/11/2020
Rep. Baird, James R. [R-IN-4] 02/11/2020
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 02/11/2020
Rep. Hagedorn, Jim [R-MN-1] 02/12/2020
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/26/2020
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 02/26/2020
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 02/26/2020
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15] 02/27/2020
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 03/02/2020
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 03/02/2020
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 03/02/2020
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 03/12/2020
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 03/12/2020
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 04/17/2020
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 04/17/2020
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/28/2020
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/12/2020
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [R-NJ-2] 06/26/2020
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 06/26/2020
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 07/21/2020
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/21/2020
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/21/2020
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 07/21/2020
Rep. Timmons, William R. IV [R-SC-4] 07/21/2020
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 07/21/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/21/2020
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/21/2020
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 07/21/2020
Rep. Bishop, Dan [R-NC-9] 07/21/2020
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 07/21/2020
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/21/2020
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 07/21/2020
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/22/2020
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/22/2020
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 07/22/2020
Rep. McAdams, Ben [D-UT-4] 07/24/2020
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 07/24/2020
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 07/24/2020
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/24/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 07/24/2020
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 07/24/2020
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12] 07/24/2020
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1] 07/31/2020
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/31/2020
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 07/31/2020
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/31/2020
Rep. San Nicolas, Michael F. Q. [D-GU-At Large] 07/31/2020
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 07/31/2020
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 07/31/2020
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 09/15/2020
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 09/15/2020
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8] 09/15/2020
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/15/2020
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 09/15/2020
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 09/15/2020
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/17/2020
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 09/17/2020
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 09/17/2020
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 09/23/2020
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 09/23/2020
Rep. Burchett, Tim [R-TN-2] 09/30/2020
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/30/2020
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/30/2020
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 09/30/2020
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/30/2020
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 10/02/2020
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 10/02/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services11/08/2019 Referred to
Committee on House Administration11/08/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5002. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/08/2019)

United States Army Rangers Veterans of World War II Congressional Gold Medal Act

This bill directs the President pro tempore of the Senate and the Speaker of the House of Representatives to arrange for the award of a single gold medal to the U.S. Army Ranger veterans of World War II in recognition of their dedicated wartime service.

Following its award, the gold medal shall be given to the Smithsonian Institution where it shall be available for display and research.