There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Poison Center Network Enhancement Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Poison Center Network Enhancement Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize and enhance the poison center national toll-free number, national media campaign, and grant program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
02/25/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2052-2053)
01/11/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber
02/26/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
02/25/2019-4:45pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/25/2019-4:45pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2052-2053)
02/25/2019-4:39pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 501.
02/25/2019-4:39pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2052-2053)
02/25/2019-4:38pmHouseMr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
01/25/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/11/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
01/11/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5]* 01/11/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3]* 01/11/2019
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 02/25/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/11/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health01/25/2019 Referred to
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions02/26/2019 Referred to

As of 01/18/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.501 - Poison Center Network Enhancement Act of 2019


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.501. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/11/2019)

Poison Center Network Enhancement Act of 2019

This bill reauthorizes for FY2020-FY2024 and revises the national toll-free phone number, public awareness campaign, and grant program relating to poison control centers.

Among other changes, the bill

  • supports enhancements of the national toll-free phone number, such as texting capabilities;
  • expands the public awareness campaign to include education about drug misuse; and
  • authorizes poison control centers and professional organizations to use grant funds for preventing and treating the misuse of opioids and other drugs.