There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Television Viewer Protection Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

Television Viewer Protection Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Television Viewer Protection Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Communications Act of 1934 to extend expiring provisions relating to the retransmission of signals of television broadcast stations, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/10/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9960-9961)
12/09/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-329.
11/12/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/11/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
12/10/2019-12:50pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/10/2019-12:50pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9960-9961)
12/10/2019-12:48pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5035.
12/10/2019-12:48pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9960-9961)
12/10/2019-12:48pmHouseMr. Doyle, Michael F. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
12/09/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 265.
12/09/2019HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-329.
11/20/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/20/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/14/2019HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology
11/14/2019HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology
11/13/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/12/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
11/12/2019HouseIntroduced in House
06/04/2019HouseHearings Held by the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Prior to Introduction and Referral.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce11/12/2019 Referred to
11/20/2019 Markup by
12/09/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-329
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology11/13/2019 Referred to
06/04/2019 Hearings by
11/14/2019 Markup by
11/14/2019 Reported by
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation12/11/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.5035. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (12/10/2019)

Television Viewer Protection Act of 2019

This bill addresses provisions related to the retransmission of television-station signals and applies consumer-rights and transparency requirements to consumers' cable and satellite services.

Specifically, the bill makes permanent a provision that allows a multichannel video programming distributor (MVPD) to retransmit television-station signals directly to a home if the subscriber receiving the signal resides in an unserved household located outside the local market of such a station. The bill also allows an MVPD to designate a qualified MVPD buying group to negotiate on its behalf with large broadcast ownership groups regarding retransmission consent for broadcast programming.

Further, the bill requires that providers of internet, voice, mobile, data, and MVPD services (1) engage in transparent sales and e-billing, and (2) refrain from charging a consumer for using equipment not provided by the service provider.