There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

DHS Field Engagement Accountability Act

Short Titles as Introduced

DHS Field Engagement Accountability Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

DHS Field Engagement Accountability Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

DHS Field Engagement Accountability Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to require the Department of Homeland Security to develop an engagement strategy with fusion centers, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
07/25/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5115)
03/25/2019Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-16.
01/29/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1261-1262)
01/11/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
07/29/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/25/2019SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5115)
03/25/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 47.
03/25/2019SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-16.
02/13/2019SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
01/29/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
01/29/2019-1:43pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/29/2019-1:43pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1261-1262)
01/29/2019-1:34pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 504.
01/29/2019-1:34pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1261-1263)
01/29/2019-1:34pmHouseMiss Rice (NY) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
01/11/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
01/11/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security01/11/2019 Referred to
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs01/29/2019 Referred to
02/13/2019 Markup by
03/25/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-16

As of 01/20/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.504 - DHS Field Engagement Accountability Act


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.504. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (07/25/2019)

DHS Field Engagement Accountability Act

This bill requires the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to develop and update at least once every five years a strategy for DHS engagement with fusion centers. The term "fusion center" means a collaborative effort of two or more government agencies that combines resources, expertise, or information to maximize the ability of such agencies to detect, prevent, investigate, apprehend, and respond to criminal or terrorist activity.

The Office of Intelligence and Analysis of DHS shall provide personnel and support to fusion centers, publish performance metrics for DHS field personnel assigned to fusion centers, and develop and implement training for fusion center personnel.

DHS intelligence and information components shall develop policies and metrics to ensure effective use of the unclassified Homeland Security Information Network and shall assess and implement enhancements to improve such network.