There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

AIR Safety Act of 2020
Aerial Incursion Repercussion Safety Act of 2020

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

AIR Safety Act of 2020
Aerial Incursion Repercussion Safety Act of 2020

Short Title(s) as Introduced

AIR Safety Act of 2019
Aerial Incursion Repercussion Safety Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Director of the Bureau of Land Management to study the effects of drone incursions on wildfire suppression, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
12/10/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 382 - 6 (Roll no. 243).(text: CR H7121)
12/02/2020Committee on Agriculture discharged.
12/02/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-606, Part I.
11/12/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/11/2020SenateReceived in the Senate.
12/10/2020-12:07pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/10/2020-12:07pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 382 - 6 (Roll no. 243). (text: CR H7121)
12/10/2020-11:27amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7127-7128)
12/10/2020-9:57amHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/10/2020-9:51amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5040.
12/10/2020-9:50amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7121-7122)
12/10/2020-9:50amHouseMr. Huffman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
12/02/2020HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 499.
12/02/2020HouseCommittee on Agriculture discharged.
12/02/2020HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-606, Part I.
07/29/2020HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/29/2020HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/29/2020HouseSubcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
06/18/2020HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands
12/04/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
11/26/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
11/12/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
11/12/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
11/12/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 11/12/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources11/12/2019 Referred to
07/29/2020 Markup by
12/02/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-606
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands11/26/2019 Referred to
06/18/2020 Hearings by
07/29/2020 Discharged from
House Agriculture11/12/2019 Referred to
12/02/2020 Discharged from
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry12/04/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.5040. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (12/10/2020)

Aerial Incursion Repercussion Safety Act of 2020 or the AIR Safety Act of 2020

This bill directs the Bureau of Land Management to study the effects of drone incursions on the suppression of wildfires concerning lands managed by the Department of the Interior or the Department of Agriculture.