There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Family Violence Prevention and Services Improvement Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Family Violence Prevention and Services Act to make improvements.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
11/12/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
11/21/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H9155)
Action By: House of Representatives
11/12/2019Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/12/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (65)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 11/12/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 11/12/2019
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24]* 11/12/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 11/21/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 11/21/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 11/21/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/21/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 11/21/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 11/21/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 12/05/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 12/05/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 12/05/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 12/05/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 12/05/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 12/05/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/05/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 12/05/2019
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 12/05/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 12/10/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 12/10/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 12/10/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/10/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 12/10/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 12/10/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/10/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/10/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 12/10/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 12/10/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 12/10/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 12/10/2019
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 12/10/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 12/10/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 12/10/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/10/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/10/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 12/10/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 12/10/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 12/19/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/19/2019
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 12/19/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 12/19/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 01/13/2020
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 01/13/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/13/2020
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 01/28/2020
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/04/2020
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 02/04/2020
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 02/11/2020
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 02/11/2020
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/11/2020
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/11/2020
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 02/11/2020
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/11/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 02/11/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 02/11/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 02/11/2020
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 02/11/2020
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 02/11/2020
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 02/11/2020
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 02/13/2020
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 02/26/2020
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [R-NJ-2] 02/26/2020
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/03/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 03/09/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/29/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Education and Labor11/12/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5041. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/12/2019)

Family Violence Prevention and Services Improvement Act of 2019

This bill modifies, expands, and reauthorizes through FY2024 the Family Violence and Prevention Services program, which funds emergency shelters and supports related assistance for victims of domestic violence.

Specifically, the bill requires the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to award grants and enter cooperative agreements with state and tribal domestic violence coalitions, and community-based organizations, to support prevention services. Depending on the type of organization, grant recipients must use funding to (1) provide technical assistance; (2) promote evidence-informed prevention strategies; (3) implement coordinated, community responses to reduce risk factors for family violence; and (4) develop prevention partnership strategies, among other uses.

Further, HHS must award specified grants to organizations that provide population-specific services in underserved communities and to community-based organizations that provide culturally-competent domestic violence services to racial and ethnic minority groups. The bill also establishes a grants program for tribal domestic violence coalitions to support the provision of local, tribal, family domestic or dating violence services and requires HHS to award a grant for the administration of a hotline dedicated to serving Indians affected by domestic violence.

In addition, the bill modifies certain program-wide definitions; changes the requirements for specified grant applications, eligibility criteria, and use of funds; and makes other technical revisions.