There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Global War on Terrorism Memorial Location Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the location of a memorial on the National Mall to commemorate and honor the members of the Armed Forces that served on active duty in support of the Global War on Terrorism, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/12/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
12/02/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
11/14/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8834)
Action By: House of Representatives
11/12/2019Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/12/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8]* 11/12/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 11/12/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2]* 11/12/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 11/12/2019
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6]* 11/12/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 11/12/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 11/12/2019
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2]* 11/12/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18]* 11/12/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 11/12/2019
Rep. Baird, James R. [R-IN-4]* 11/12/2019
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6]* 11/12/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14]* 11/12/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 11/12/2019
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17]* 11/12/2019
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17]* 11/12/2019
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3]* 11/12/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11]* 11/12/2019
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11]* 11/12/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8]* 11/12/2019
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2]* 11/12/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 11/12/2019
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 11/12/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2]* 11/12/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5]* 11/12/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7]* 11/12/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 11/12/2019
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11]* 11/12/2019
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 11/12/2019
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 11/12/2019
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3]* 11/12/2019
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/15/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 11/15/2019
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 11/20/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/21/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 12/04/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 12/04/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 12/04/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 12/06/2019
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 12/06/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 01/13/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 01/13/2020
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/13/2020
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 01/13/2020
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 01/13/2020
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 01/15/2020
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 01/17/2020
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 01/17/2020
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 01/17/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources11/12/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands12/02/2019 Referred to

As of 01/21/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.5046 - Global War on Terrorism Memorial Location Act


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.